House | 04/11/2023 | Coauthored by Senator(s) Stephens | ||
House | 04/11/2023 | CR; Do Pass Agriculture Committee | ||
House | 03/29/2023 | Second Reading referred to Agriculture | ||
Senate | 03/23/2023 | Engrossed to House | ||
House | 03/23/2023 | First Reading | ||
Senate | 03/22/2023 | Referred for engrossment | ||
Senate | 03/22/2023 | Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 46 Nays: 1 | ||
Senate | 03/22/2023 | General Order, Considered | ||
Senate | 03/09/2023 | Coauthored by Senator Bullard | ||
Senate | 02/22/2023 | Title stricken | ||
Senate | 02/22/2023 | Reported Do Pass as amended Appropriations committee; CR filed | ||
Senate | 02/15/2023 | Coauthored by Representative Wallace (principal House author) | ||
Senate | 02/13/2023 | Referred to Appropriations | ||
Senate | 02/13/2023 | Reported Do Pass Agriculture and Rural Affairs committee; CR filed | ||
Senate | 02/07/2023 | Second Reading referred to Agriculture and Rural Affairs Committee then to Appropriations Committee | ||
Senate | 02/06/2023 | Authored by Senator Kidd |