Oklahoma 2023 Regular Session

Oklahoma Senate Bill SB1010 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 19, 2023

Engrossed

Bill May 1, 2023
Bill March 6, 2023

Amended

Bill April 12, 2023
Bill February 21, 2023