Senate
|
05/26/2023
|
Died in conference
|
|
|
House
|
05/22/2023
|
Conference granted, naming GCCA
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2023
|
SCs named GCCA
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/08/2023
|
HAs rejected, conference requested
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2023
|
Coauthored by Representative Deck
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2023
|
HAs read
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2023
|
Engrossed, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2023
|
Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 91 Nays: 3
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2023
|
Coauthored by Representative(s) Hill
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2023
|
General Order
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2023
|
Referred for engrossment
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2023
|
Enacting clause stricken
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2023
|
Coauthored by Representative(s) Boles, Schreiber, Pae, Baker
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2023
|
CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations and Budget Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/10/2023
|
Recommendation to the full committee; Do Pass Appropriations and Budget Finance - Revenue and Taxation Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
03/29/2023
|
Referred to Appropriations and Budget Finance - Revenue and Taxation Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
03/29/2023
|
Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2023
|
Engrossed to House
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2023
|
Measure passed: Ayes: 36 Nays: 7
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2023
|
General Order, Considered
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/14/2023
|
Coauthored by Representative Lawson (principal House author)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/01/2023
|
Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/20/2023
|
Referred to Appropriations
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/20/2023
|
Title stricken
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/20/2023
|
Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Finance committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/07/2023
|
Second Reading referred to Finance Committee then to Appropriations Committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/06/2023
|
Authored by Senator Garvin
|
|
|