Senate | 05/01/2023 | HAs read | ||
House | 05/01/2023 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | ||
House | 04/27/2023 | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 84 Nays: 6 | ||
House | 04/27/2023 | Amended | ||
House | 04/27/2023 | General Order | ||
House | 04/27/2023 | Referred for engrossment | ||
House | 04/19/2023 | Enacting clause stricken | ||
House | 04/19/2023 | Coauthored by Representative(s) Boles | ||
House | 04/19/2023 | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations and Budget Committee | ||
House | 03/29/2023 | Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget | ||
Senate | 03/21/2023 | Engrossed to House | ||
House | 03/21/2023 | First Reading | ||
Senate | 03/20/2023 | Measure passed: Ayes: 27 Nays: 17 | ||
Senate | 03/20/2023 | General Order, Considered | ||
Senate | 02/27/2023 | Reported Do Pass Finance committee; CR filed | ||
Senate | 02/27/2023 | Coauthored by Representative Wallace (principal House author) | ||
Senate | 02/09/2023 | Referred to Finance | ||
Senate | 02/09/2023 | Title stricken | ||
Senate | 02/09/2023 | Reported Do Pass as amended Energy and Telecommunications committee; CR filed | ||
Senate | 02/07/2023 | Second Reading referred to Energy and Telecommunications Committee then to Finance Committee | ||
Senate | 02/06/2023 | Authored by Senator Montgomery |