Oklahoma 2023 Regular Session

Oklahoma Senate Bill SB1094 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 19, 2023

Engrossed

Bill March 1, 2023

Enrolled

Bill April 25, 2023

Amended

Bill April 10, 2023
Bill February 15, 2023