Oklahoma 2023 Regular Session

Oklahoma Senate Bill SB119 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 3, 2023

Engrossed

Bill April 25, 2023
Bill March 23, 2023

Amended

Bill April 20, 2023
Bill March 2, 2023