Oklahoma 2023 Regular Session

Oklahoma Senate Bill SB161 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 4, 2023

Engrossed

Bill February 23, 2023

Enrolled

Bill April 19, 2023

Amended

Bill April 6, 2023
Bill February 9, 2023