Oklahoma 2023 Regular Session

Oklahoma Senate Bill SB173 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 5, 2023

Engrossed

Bill March 7, 2023

Enrolled

Bill April 19, 2023

Amended

Bill April 10, 2023
Bill February 14, 2023