Oklahoma 2023 Regular Session

Oklahoma Senate Bill SB19 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill December 9, 2022

Engrossed

Bill March 21, 2023

Enrolled

Bill April 18, 2023

Amended

Bill April 10, 2023
Bill February 13, 2023