Oklahoma 2023 Regular Session

Oklahoma Senate Bill SB200 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 9, 2023

Engrossed

Bill April 18, 2023
Bill March 14, 2023

Enrolled

Bill May 25, 2023

Amended

Bill April 6, 2023
Bill February 27, 2023

Comm Sub

Bill April 6, 2023
Bill February 23, 2023