Senate | 03/01/2023 | Coauthored by Representative Hilbert (principal House author) | ||
Senate | 03/01/2023 | Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations committee; CR filed | ||
Senate | 02/09/2023 | Coauthored by Senator Jett | ||
Senate | 02/09/2023 | Referred to Appropriations | ||
Senate | 02/09/2023 | Title stricken | ||
Senate | 02/09/2023 | Reported Do Pass as amended Energy and Telecommunications committee; CR filed | ||
Senate | 02/08/2023 | Coauthored by Senator Bullard | ||
Senate | 02/07/2023 | Second Reading referred to Energy and Telecommunications Committee then to Appropriations Committee | ||
Senate | 02/06/2023 | Authored by Senator Dahm | ||
Senate | 02/06/2023 | First Reading |