Oklahoma 2023 Regular Session

Oklahoma Senate Bill SB209 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 9, 2023

Engrossed

Bill March 13, 2023

Amended

Bill April 11, 2023
Bill February 14, 2023

Comm Sub

Bill February 13, 2023