Senate
|
06/06/2023
|
Approved by Governor 06/06/2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2023
|
Coauthored by Senator Pederson
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2023
|
Sent to Governor
|
|
|
House
|
05/22/2023
|
Signed, returned to Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2023
|
Enrolled, to House
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2023
|
Coauthored by Senator Bergstrom
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2023
|
Referred for enrollment
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2023
|
Measure passed: Ayes: 40 Nays: 6
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2023
|
HAs adopted
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2023
|
Coauthored by Representative Wolfley
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2023
|
HAs read
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2023
|
Engrossed, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2023
|
Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 78 Nays: 6
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2023
|
Amended by floor substitute
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2023
|
Coauthored by Representative(s) Boles
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2023
|
General Order
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2023
|
House Rule suspended
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2023
|
Referred for engrossment
|
|
|
House
|
04/05/2023
|
Title restored
|
|
|
House
|
04/05/2023
|
Coauthored by Senator(s) Woods
|
|
|
House
|
04/05/2023
|
CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Business and Commerce Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/29/2023
|
Second Reading referred to Business and Commerce
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2023
|
Engrossed to House
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2023
|
First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2023
|
Coauthored by Senator Hamilton
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2023
|
Measure passed: Ayes: 46 Nays: 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2023
|
General Order, Considered
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/01/2023
|
Coauthored by Senator Jett
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/01/2023
|
Coauthored by Senator Stephens
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/01/2023
|
Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/20/2023
|
Coauthored by Senator Burns
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/14/2023
|
Referred to Appropriations
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/14/2023
|
Title stricken
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/14/2023
|
Reported Do Pass as amended Judiciary committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/09/2023
|
Coauthored by Representative Humphrey (principal House author)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/07/2023
|
Referred to Judiciary Committee then to Appropriations Committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/07/2023
|
Withdrawn from Judiciary committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/07/2023
|
Second Reading referred to Judiciary
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/06/2023
|
Authored by Senator Bullard
|
|
|