Oklahoma 2023 2023 Regular Session

Oklahoma Senate Bill SB222 Introduced / Bill

Filed 01/09/2023

                     
 
 
Req. No. 1360 	Page 1  1 
2 
3 
4 
5 
6 
7 
8 
9 
10 
11 
12 
13 
14 
15 
16 
17 
18 
19 
20 
21 
22 
23 
24 
   1 
2 
3 
4 
5 
6 
7 
8 
9 
10 
11 
12 
13 
14 
15 
16 
17 
18 
19 
20 
21 
22 
23 
24 
  
STATE OF OKLAHOMA 
 
1st Session of the 59th Legislature (2023) 
 
SENATE BILL 222 	By: Daniels 
 
 
 
 
 
AS INTRODUCED 
 
An Act relating to the practice of alcohol and drug 
counseling; amending 59 O.S. 2021, Section 1873, 
which relates to the Oklahoma Board of Licensed 
Alcohol and Drug Counselors ; removing certain 
limitation on appointees; permitting the Governor to 
consider certain recommendations ; and providing an 
effective date. 
 
 
 
 
 
BE IT ENACTED BY THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF OKLAHOMA: 
SECTION 1.     AMENDATORY     59 O.S. 2021, Section 1873, is 
amended to read as follows: 
Section 1873. A.  There is hereby re -created, to continue until 
July 1, 2023, in accordance with the provis ions of the Oklahoma 
Sunset Law, the Oklahoma Board of Licensed Alcohol and Drug 
Counselors, consisting of seven (7) members, to be appointed by the 
Governor, with the advice and consent of the Senate, as follows: 
1. a. Six members who shall be alcohol and drug counselors 
certified by an entity recognized to do professional 
alcohol and drug counseli ng certification in this 
state; provided, however, five o f such members shall   
 
 
Req. No. 1360 	Page 2  1 
2 
3 
4 
5 
6 
7 
8 
9 
10 
11 
12 
13 
14 
15 
16 
17 
18 
19 
20 
21 
22 
23 
24 
   1 
2 
3 
4 
5 
6 
7 
8 
9 
10 
11 
12 
13 
14 
15 
16 
17 
18 
19 
20 
21 
22 
23 
24 
  
subsequently secure licensure and one such member 
shall subsequently secure certifi cation, pursuant to 
the provisions of the Licensed Alcohol and Drug 
Counselors Act, no later th an January 1, 2005. 
b. Thereafter, five members shall be licensed alcohol and 
drug counselors at the time of appointment, and one 
member shall be certified as an alcohol and drug 
counselor at the time of appointm ent. 
c. Pursuant to the provisions of this p aragraph, the 
Governor shall appoint: 
(1) four members from a list of names submitted by 
the Oklahoma Drug and Alcohol Professional 
Counselors Association, 
(2) one member from a list of names submitted by the 
Oklahoma Substance Abuse Services Alliance, and 
(3) one member from a list of names submitted by the 
Oklahoma Citizen Advocates for Recovery and 
Treatment Association 
 In selecting appointees, the Governor may consider 
recommendations from a statewide organiz ation 
representing alcohol and drug counselors , a state 
chapter of a national organization representi ng 
alcohol and drug counselors , a statewide organization   
 
 
Req. No. 1360 	Page 3  1 
2 
3 
4 
5 
6 
7 
8 
9 
10 
11 
12 
13 
14 
15 
16 
17 
18 
19 
20 
21 
22 
23 
24 
   1 
2 
3 
4 
5 
6 
7 
8 
9 
10 
11 
12 
13 
14 
15 
16 
17 
18 
19 
20 
21 
22 
23 
24 
  
representing individuals in recovery, or other groups 
or individuals in this state . 
d. One member shall be appointed from and shall represent 
the general public.  Such member shall be a resident 
of this state who has at tained the age of majority and 
shall not be, nor shall ever have been, a licensed or 
certified alcohol and drug counselor, or the spous e of 
a licensed or certified alcohol and drug counselor, or 
a person who has ever had any material fi nancial 
interest in the provision of alcohol and drug 
counseling services or has engaged in any activity 
directly related to the practice of alcohol and dr ug 
counseling. 
2.  The composition of the Board shall include five members who 
hold a master’s or higher degree and one m ember whose highest degree 
held is a bachelor’s degree. 
3.  The Governor shall appoi nt the members to the Board no later 
than July 1, 2004. 
B.  Each member of the Board appointed as a licensed alcohol and 
drug counselor shall: 
1.  Be certified or licensed to engage in the practice of 
alcohol and drug counseling in this state and shall be in good 
standing; and   
 
 
Req. No. 1360 	Page 4  1 
2 
3 
4 
5 
6 
7 
8 
9 
10 
11 
12 
13 
14 
15 
16 
17 
18 
19 
20 
21 
22 
23 
24 
   1 
2 
3 
4 
5 
6 
7 
8 
9 
10 
11 
12 
13 
14 
15 
16 
17 
18 
19 
20 
21 
22 
23 
24 
  
2.  Have at least three (3) y ears of experience in the practice 
of alcohol and drug counseling in this state. 
C.  Two of the membe rs initially appoint ed shall serve three -
year terms; two shall serve four -year terms and three shall ser ve 
five-year terms, as designated by the Governor. Thereafter, the 
terms of all members shall be five (5) years. 
D.  A vacancy on the Board shall be fi lled in the same man ner as 
the original appointment for the balance of the unexpired term.  
Members may succeed themselves but shall serve no more than two 
consecutive terms.  Each member shall serve until a successor is 
appointed and qualified. 
E.  Members of the Board may b e removed from office for one or 
more of the following reasons: 
1.  The refusal or i nability for any reason to perform the 
duties of a Board member in an efficient, responsible and 
professional manner; 
2.  The misuse of office for pecun iary or material gai n or for 
personal advantage for self or another; 
3.  A violation of the laws or rule s governing the practice of 
alcohol and drug counse ling; or 
4.  Conviction of a felony as verified by a certified copy of 
the record of the court of con viction.   
 
 
Req. No. 1360 	Page 5  1 
2 
3 
4 
5 
6 
7 
8 
9 
10 
11 
12 
13 
14 
15 
16 
17 
18 
19 
20 
21 
22 
23 
24 
   1 
2 
3 
4 
5 
6 
7 
8 
9 
10 
11 
12 
13 
14 
15 
16 
17 
18 
19 
20 
21 
22 
23 
24 
  
F.  Members of the Board shall serve without compensation, but 
shall be reimbursed for actual a nd necessary travel expenses as 
provided in the State Travel Reimbursement Act. 
SECTION 2.  This act shall become effective November 1, 2023. 
 
59-1-1360 DC 1/9/2023 5:56:39 PM