Oklahoma 2023 Regular Session

Oklahoma Senate Bill SB222 Compare Versions

OldNewDifferences
11
22
3-SENATE FLOOR VERSION - SB222 SFLR Page 1
4-(Bold face denotes Committee Amendments) 1
3+
4+Req. No. 1360 Page 1 1
5+2
6+3
7+4
8+5
9+6
10+7
11+8
12+9
13+10
14+11
15+12
16+13
17+14
18+15
19+16
20+17
21+18
22+19
23+20
24+21
25+22
26+23
27+24
28+ 1
529 2
630 3
731 4
832 5
933 6
1034 7
1135 8
1236 9
1337 10
1438 11
1539 12
1640 13
1741 14
1842 15
1943 16
2044 17
2145 18
2246 19
2347 20
2448 21
2549 22
2650 23
2751 24
2852
29-SENATE FLOOR VERSION
30-February 16, 2023
53+STATE OF OKLAHOMA
3154
55+1st Session of the 59th Legislature (2023)
3256
33-SENATE BILL NO. 222 By: Daniels
57+SENATE BILL 222 By: Daniels
3458
3559
3660
3761
3862
39-
63+AS INTRODUCED
4064
4165 An Act relating to the practice of alcohol and drug
4266 counseling; amending 59 O.S. 2021, Section 1873,
4367 which relates to the Oklahoma Board of Licensed
4468 Alcohol and Drug Counselors ; removing certain
4569 limitation on appointees; permitting the Governor to
4670 consider certain recommendations ; and providing an
4771 effective date.
48-
49-
5072
5173
5274
5375
5476
5577 BE IT ENACTED BY THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF OKLAHOMA:
5678 SECTION 1. AMENDATORY 59 O.S. 2021, Section 1873, is
5779 amended to read as follows:
5880 Section 1873. A. There is hereby re -created, to continue until
5981 July 1, 2023, in accordance with the provis ions of the Oklahoma
6082 Sunset Law, the Oklahoma Board of Licensed Alcohol and Drug
6183 Counselors, consisting of seven (7) members, to be appointed by the
6284 Governor, with the advice and consent of the Senate, as follows:
6385 1. a. Six members who shall be alcohol and drug counselors
6486 certified by an entity recognized to do professional
6587 alcohol and drug counseli ng certification in this
88+state; provided, however, five o f such members shall
6689
67-SENATE FLOOR VERSION - SB222 SFLR Page 2
68-(Bold face denotes Committee Amendments) 1
90+
91+Req. No. 1360 Page 2 1
92+2
93+3
94+4
95+5
96+6
97+7
98+8
99+9
100+10
101+11
102+12
103+13
104+14
105+15
106+16
107+17
108+18
109+19
110+20
111+21
112+22
113+23
114+24
115+ 1
69116 2
70117 3
71118 4
72119 5
73120 6
74121 7
75122 8
76123 9
77124 10
78125 11
79126 12
80127 13
81128 14
82129 15
83130 16
84131 17
85132 18
86133 19
87134 20
88135 21
89136 22
90137 23
91138 24
92139
93-state; provided, however, five o f such members shall
94140 subsequently secure licensure and one such member
95141 shall subsequently secure certifi cation, pursuant to
96142 the provisions of the Licensed Alcohol and Drug
97143 Counselors Act, no later th an January 1, 2005.
98144 b. Thereafter, five members shall be licensed alcohol and
99145 drug counselors at the time of appointment, and one
100146 member shall be certified as an alcohol and drug
101147 counselor at the time of appointm ent.
102148 c. Pursuant to the provisions of this p aragraph, the
103149 Governor shall appoint:
104150 (1) four members from a list of names submitted by
105151 the Oklahoma Drug and Alcohol Professional
106152 Counselors Association,
107153 (2) one member from a list of names submitted by the
108154 Oklahoma Substance Abuse Services Alliance, and
109155 (3) one member from a list of names submitted by the
110156 Oklahoma Citizen Advocates for Recovery and
111157 Treatment Association
112158 In selecting appointees, the Governor may consider
113159 recommendations from a statewide organiz ation
114160 representing alcohol and drug counselors , a state
115161 chapter of a national organization representi ng
116162 alcohol and drug counselors , a statewide organization
117163
118-SENATE FLOOR VERSION - SB222 SFLR Page 3
119-(Bold face denotes Committee Amendments) 1
164+
165+Req. No. 1360 Page 3 1
166+2
167+3
168+4
169+5
170+6
171+7
172+8
173+9
174+10
175+11
176+12
177+13
178+14
179+15
180+16
181+17
182+18
183+19
184+20
185+21
186+22
187+23
188+24
189+ 1
120190 2
121191 3
122192 4
123193 5
124194 6
125195 7
126196 8
127197 9
128198 10
129199 11
130200 12
131201 13
132202 14
133203 15
134204 16
135205 17
136206 18
137207 19
138208 20
139209 21
140210 22
141211 23
142212 24
143213
144214 representing individuals in recovery, or other groups
145215 or individuals in this state .
146216 d. One member shall be appointed from and shall represent
147217 the general public. Such member shall be a resident
148218 of this state who has at tained the age of majority and
149219 shall not be, nor shall ever have been, a licensed or
150220 certified alcohol and drug counselor, or the spous e of
151221 a licensed or certified alcohol and drug counselor, or
152222 a person who has ever had any material fi nancial
153223 interest in the provision of alcohol and drug
154224 counseling services or has engaged in any activity
155225 directly related to the practice of alcohol and dr ug
156226 counseling.
157227 2. The composition of the Board shall include five members who
158228 hold a master’s or higher degree and one m ember whose highest degree
159229 held is a bachelor’s degree.
160230 3. The Governor shall appoi nt the members to the Board no later
161231 than July 1, 2004.
162232 B. Each member of the Board appointed as a licensed alcohol and
163233 drug counselor shall:
164234 1. Be certified or licensed to engage in the practice of
165235 alcohol and drug counseling in this state and shall be in good
166236 standing; and
167237
168-SENATE FLOOR VERSION - SB222 SFLR Page 4
169-(Bold face denotes Committee Amendments) 1
238+
239+Req. No. 1360 Page 4 1
240+2
241+3
242+4
243+5
244+6
245+7
246+8
247+9
248+10
249+11
250+12
251+13
252+14
253+15
254+16
255+17
256+18
257+19
258+20
259+21
260+22
261+23
262+24
263+ 1
170264 2
171265 3
172266 4
173267 5
174268 6
175269 7
176270 8
177271 9
178272 10
179273 11
180274 12
181275 13
182276 14
183277 15
184278 16
185279 17
186280 18
187281 19
188282 20
189283 21
190284 22
191285 23
192286 24
193287
194288 2. Have at least three (3) y ears of experience in the practice
195289 of alcohol and drug counseling in this state.
196290 C. Two of the membe rs initially appoint ed shall serve three -
197291 year terms; two shall serve four -year terms and three shall ser ve
198292 five-year terms, as designated by the Governor. Thereafter, the
199293 terms of all members shall be five (5) years.
200294 D. A vacancy on the Board shall be fi lled in the same man ner as
201295 the original appointment for the balance of the unexpired term.
202296 Members may succeed themselves but shall serve no more than two
203297 consecutive terms. Each member shall serve until a successor is
204298 appointed and qualified.
205299 E. Members of the Board may b e removed from office for one or
206300 more of the following reasons:
207301 1. The refusal or i nability for any reason to perform the
208302 duties of a Board member in an efficient, responsible and
209303 professional manner;
210304 2. The misuse of office for pecun iary or material gai n or for
211305 personal advantage for self or another;
212306 3. A violation of the laws or rule s governing the practice of
213307 alcohol and drug counse ling; or
214308 4. Conviction of a felony as verified by a certified copy of
215309 the record of the court of con viction.
216310
217-SENATE FLOOR VERSION - SB222 SFLR Page 5
218-(Bold face denotes Committee Amendments) 1
311+
312+Req. No. 1360 Page 5 1
313+2
314+3
315+4
316+5
317+6
318+7
319+8
320+9
321+10
322+11
323+12
324+13
325+14
326+15
327+16
328+17
329+18
330+19
331+20
332+21
333+22
334+23
335+24
336+ 1
219337 2
220338 3
221339 4
222340 5
223341 6
224342 7
225343 8
226344 9
227345 10
228346 11
229347 12
230348 13
231349 14
232350 15
233351 16
234352 17
235353 18
236354 19
237355 20
238356 21
239357 22
240358 23
241359 24
242360
243361 F. Members of the Board shall serve without compensation, but
244362 shall be reimbursed for actual a nd necessary travel expenses as
245363 provided in the State Travel Reimbursement Act.
246364 SECTION 2. This act shall become effective November 1, 2023.
247-COMMITTEE REPORT BY: COMMITTEE ON HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES
248-February 16, 2023 - DO PASS
365+
366+59-1-1360 DC 1/9/2023 5:56:39 PM