Senate
|
05/17/2023
|
SCs named Stewart, Coleman, Paxton, Garvin, Matthews
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2023
|
HAs rejected, conference requested
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2023
|
HAs read
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2023
|
Engrossed, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2023
|
Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 93 Nays: 0
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2023
|
Title stricken
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2023
|
Amended
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2023
|
General Order
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2023
|
Referred for engrossment
|
|
|
House
|
04/05/2023
|
CR; Do Pass Criminal Justice and Corrections Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/29/2023
|
Second Reading referred to Criminal Justice and Corrections
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2023
|
Engrossed to House
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2023
|
First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/20/2023
|
Measure passed: Ayes: 45 Nays: 1
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/20/2023
|
General Order, Considered
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2023
|
Coauthored by Representative Cantrell (principal House author)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/13/2023
|
Reported Do Pass Business and Commerce committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/07/2023
|
Second Reading referred to Business and Commerce
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/06/2023
|
Coauthored by Senator Garvin
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/06/2023
|
Remove as author Senator Garvin; authored by Senator Stewart
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/06/2023
|
Authored by Senator Garvin
|
|
|