Oklahoma 2023 Regular Session

Oklahoma Senate Bill SB247 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 10, 2023

Engrossed

Bill March 14, 2023

Enrolled

Bill April 19, 2023

Amended

Bill April 11, 2023
Bill March 6, 2023

Comm Sub

Bill March 2, 2023