Oklahoma 2023 Regular Session

Oklahoma Senate Bill SB266 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 10, 2023

Engrossed

Bill May 1, 2023
Bill February 14, 2023

Enrolled

Bill May 25, 2023

Amended

Bill April 6, 2023
Bill February 8, 2023

Comm Sub

Bill April 6, 2023