House
|
05/25/2023
|
Veto override message received
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2023
|
Measure sent to House
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2023
|
Veto overridden: Ayes: 42 Nays: 3
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2023
|
Vetoed 04/26/2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2023
|
Sent to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2023
|
Enrolled, to House
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2023
|
Signed, returned to Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2023
|
Referred for enrollment
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2023
|
Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 85 Nays: 7
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2023
|
General Order
|
|
|
House
|
04/06/2023
|
Coauthored by Representative(s) Pittman
|
|
|
House
|
04/06/2023
|
CR; Do Pass Public Health Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/29/2023
|
Second Reading referred to Public Health
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/20/2023
|
Engrossed to House
|
|
|
House
|
03/20/2023
|
First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/14/2023
|
Referred for engrossment
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/14/2023
|
Measure passed: Ayes: 45 Nays: 1
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/14/2023
|
General Order, Considered
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/02/2023
|
Reported Do Pass Health and Human Services committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/23/2023
|
Coauthored by Representative Fugate
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/15/2023
|
Coauthored by Representative Boatman (principal House author)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/07/2023
|
Second Reading referred to Health and Human Services
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/06/2023
|
Coauthored by Senator Garvin
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/06/2023
|
Remove as author Senator Garvin; authored by Senator Seifried
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/06/2023
|
Authored by Senator Garvin
|
|
|