Oklahoma 2023 Regular Session

Oklahoma Senate Bill SB27 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill December 13, 2022

Engrossed

Bill May 1, 2023
Bill March 6, 2023

Enrolled

Bill May 26, 2023

Amended

Bill April 14, 2023
Bill February 16, 2023