House | 04/27/2023 | Third Reading, Measure failed: Ayes: 15 Nays: 67 | ||
House | 04/27/2023 | General Order | ||
House | 04/13/2023 | CR; Do Pass Appropriations and Budget Committee | ||
House | 04/03/2023 | Recommendation to the full committee; Do Pass Appropriations and Budget Human Services Subcommittee | ||
House | 03/29/2023 | Referred to Appropriations and Budget Human Services Subcommittee | ||
House | 03/29/2023 | Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget | ||
Senate | 02/27/2023 | Engrossed to House | ||
House | 02/27/2023 | First Reading | ||
Senate | 02/23/2023 | Referred for engrossment | ||
Senate | 02/23/2023 | Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 45 Nays: 0 | ||
Senate | 02/23/2023 | General Order, Considered | ||
Senate | 02/16/2023 | Reported Do Pass Health and Human Services committee; CR filed | ||
Senate | 02/07/2023 | Second Reading referred to Health and Human Services | ||
Senate | 02/06/2023 | Coauthored by Representative Talley (principal House author) | ||
Senate | 02/06/2023 | Authored by Senator Coleman |