Oklahoma 2023 Regular Session

Oklahoma Senate Bill SB286 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 12, 2023

Engrossed

Bill March 20, 2023

Enrolled

Bill April 24, 2023

Amended

Bill April 6, 2023
Bill February 27, 2023