Senate
|
05/26/2023
|
Filed with Secretary of State
|
|
|
House
|
05/26/2023
|
To Senate
|
|
|
House
|
05/26/2023
|
Veto overridden: Ayes: 93 Nays: 0
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2023
|
Veto override message received
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2023
|
Measure sent to House
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2023
|
Veto overridden: Ayes: 45 Nays: 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2023
|
Vetoed 04/26/2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2023
|
Sent to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2023
|
Enrolled, to House
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2023
|
Signed, returned to Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2023
|
Referred for enrollment
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2023
|
Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 93 Nays: 0
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2023
|
General Order
|
|
|
House
|
04/05/2023
|
CR; Do Pass Judiciary - Criminal Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/29/2023
|
Second Reading referred to Judiciary - Criminal
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2023
|
Engrossed to House
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2023
|
First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/20/2023
|
Coauthored by Senator Garvin
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/20/2023
|
Referred for engrossment
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/20/2023
|
Measure passed: Ayes: 46 Nays: 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/20/2023
|
General Order, Considered
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/14/2023
|
Coauthored by Representative Newton (principal House author)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/13/2023
|
Coauthored by Senator Boren
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/07/2023
|
Reported Do Pass Judiciary committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/07/2023
|
Second Reading referred to Judiciary
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/06/2023
|
Authored by Senator Murdock
|
|
|