Oklahoma 2023 Regular Session

Oklahoma Senate Bill SB299 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 12, 2023

Engrossed

Bill March 9, 2023

Enrolled

Bill April 26, 2023

Amended

Bill April 14, 2023
Bill February 15, 2023