Senate
|
05/25/2023
|
Title restored
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2023
|
Enacting clause restored
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2023
|
CCR read
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2023
|
SCs named Coleman, Jech, Rader, Howard, Daniels, Stewart, Kirt
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2023
|
Withdrawn from GCCA - referred to conference
|
|
|
House
|
05/24/2023
|
Conference granted, naming GCCA
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2023
|
SCs named GCCA
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2023
|
HAs rejected, conference requested
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2023
|
Coauthored by Representative Pittman
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2023
|
HAs read
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2023
|
Engrossed, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2023
|
Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 88 Nays: 3
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2023
|
General Order
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2023
|
Referred for engrossment
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2023
|
Enacting clause stricken
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2023
|
Coauthored by Representative(s) Fetgatter
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2023
|
CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations and Budget Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/10/2023
|
Recommendation to the full committee; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations and Budget Finance - Revenue and Taxation Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
03/29/2023
|
Referred to Appropriations and Budget Finance - Revenue and Taxation Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
03/29/2023
|
Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2023
|
Engrossed to House
|
|
|
House
|
03/27/2023
|
First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2023
|
Coauthored by Senator Bergstrom
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2023
|
Measure passed: Ayes: 32 Nays: 15
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2023
|
General Order, Considered
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/01/2023
|
Title stricken
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/01/2023
|
Reported Do Pass as amended Appropriations committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/23/2023
|
Coauthored by Representative Moore (principal House author)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/07/2023
|
Second Reading referred to Appropriations
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/06/2023
|
Authored by Senator Coleman
|
|
|