Senate | 05/01/2023 | Approved by Governor 05/01/2023 | ||
Senate | 04/25/2023 | Sent to Governor | ||
Senate | 04/25/2023 | Enrolled, to House | ||
House | 04/25/2023 | Signed, returned to Senate | ||
Senate | 04/24/2023 | Referred for enrollment | ||
House | 04/24/2023 | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 91 Nays: 0 | ||
House | 04/24/2023 | General Order | ||
House | 04/11/2023 | Coauthored by Representative(s) Deck | ||
House | 04/11/2023 | CR; Do Pass Rural Development Committee | ||
House | 03/29/2023 | Second Reading referred to Rural Development | ||
Senate | 03/08/2023 | Engrossed to House | ||
House | 03/08/2023 | First Reading | ||
Senate | 03/07/2023 | Referred for engrossment | ||
Senate | 03/07/2023 | Measure passed: Ayes: 43 Nays: 0 | ||
Senate | 03/07/2023 | General Order, Considered | ||
Senate | 02/27/2023 | Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Finance committee; CR filed | ||
Senate | 02/07/2023 | Second Reading referred to Finance | ||
Senate | 02/06/2023 | Coauthored by Representative Sneed (principal House author) | ||
Senate | 02/06/2023 | Authored by Senator Pemberton |