House | 03/29/2023 | Second Reading referred to Common Education | ||
Senate | 03/14/2023 | Engrossed to House | ||
House | 03/14/2023 | First Reading | ||
Senate | 03/13/2023 | Referred for engrossment | ||
Senate | 03/13/2023 | Emergency failed: Ayes: 31 Nays: 15 | ||
Senate | 03/13/2023 | Measure passed: Ayes: 27 Nays: 19 | ||
Senate | 03/13/2023 | Title restored | ||
Senate | 03/13/2023 | General Order, Amended | ||
Senate | 03/01/2023 | Reported Do Pass as amended Appropriations committee; CR filed | ||
Senate | 02/21/2023 | Coauthored by Representative Conley | ||
Senate | 02/20/2023 | Coauthored by Representative Echols (principal House author) | ||
Senate | 02/14/2023 | Referred to Appropriations | ||
Senate | 02/14/2023 | Title stricken | ||
Senate | 02/14/2023 | Reported Do Pass as amended Education committee; CR filed | ||
Senate | 02/07/2023 | Second Reading referred to Education Committee then to Appropriations Committee | ||
Senate | 02/06/2023 | Authored by Senator Daniels |