Oklahoma 2023 Regular Session

Oklahoma Senate Bill SB375 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 15, 2023

Engrossed

Bill April 27, 2023
Bill March 13, 2023

Enrolled

Bill May 23, 2023

Amended

Bill April 6, 2023
Bill February 15, 2023

Comm Sub

Bill April 6, 2023