House | 03/29/2023 | Second Reading referred to Public Safety | ||
Senate | 03/27/2023 | Engrossed to House | ||
House | 03/27/2023 | First Reading | ||
Senate | 03/23/2023 | Referred for engrossment | ||
Senate | 03/23/2023 | Measure passed: Ayes: 42 Nays: 5 | ||
Senate | 03/23/2023 | General Order, Considered | ||
Senate | 03/14/2023 | Coauthored by Representative Roe (principal House author) | ||
Senate | 02/23/2023 | Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Public Safety committee; CR filed | ||
Senate | 02/06/2023 | Coauthored by Senator Boren | ||
Senate | 02/06/2023 | Authored by Senator Daniels |