Oklahoma 2023 Regular Session

Oklahoma Senate Bill SB380 Latest Draft

Bill / Introduced Version Filed 01/15/2023

                             
 
 
Req. No. 175 	Page 1  1 
2 
3 
4 
5 
6 
7 
8 
9 
10 
11 
12 
13 
14 
15 
16 
17 
18 
19 
20 
21 
22 
23 
24 
   1 
2 
3 
4 
5 
6 
7 
8 
9 
10 
11 
12 
13 
14 
15 
16 
17 
18 
19 
20 
21 
22 
23 
24 
  
STATE OF OKLAHOMA 
 
1st Session of the 59th Legislature (2023) 
 
SENATE BILL 380 	By: Bergstrom 
 
 
 
 
 
AS INTRODUCED 
 
An Act relating to tax credit; amending 68 O.S. 2021, 
Section 2357.403, as amended by Section 1, Chapter 
139, O.S.L. 2022 (68 O.S. Sup p. 2022, Section 
2357.403), which relates to the Oklahoma Affordable 
Housing Act; making credit refundable for certain tax 
years; and providing an effective date.  
 
 
 
 
BE IT ENACTED BY THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF OKLAHOMA: 
SECTION 1.     AMENDATORY     68 O.S. 2021, Section 2357.403, as 
amended by Section 1, Chapter 139, O.S.L. 2022 (68 O.S. Supp. 2022, 
Section 2357.403), is amended to read as fo llows: 
Section 2357.403. A.  This act shall be known and may be cited 
as the "Oklahoma Affordable Housing Act". 
B.  As used in this section: 
1.  "Allocation year" means the year for which the Oklahoma 
Housing Finance Agency all ocates credits pursuant to this section; 
2.  "Eligibility statemen t" means a statement authorized and 
issued by the Oklahoma Housing Finance Agency certifying that a 
given project qualifies for the Oklahoma Affordable Housing Tax 
Credit authorized by this section. The Oklahoma Housing Finance   
 
 
Req. No. 175 	Page 2  1 
2 
3 
4 
5 
6 
7 
8 
9 
10 
11 
12 
13 
14 
15 
16 
17 
18 
19 
20 
21 
22 
23 
24 
   1 
2 
3 
4 
5 
6 
7 
8 
9 
10 
11 
12 
13 
14 
15 
16 
17 
18 
19 
20 
21 
22 
23 
24 
  
Agency, under Title 330, Ok lahoma Housing Finance Agency, Chapter 
36, Affordable Housing Tax Credit Program Rules, shall promulgate 
rules establishing criteri a upon which the eligibility statements 
will be issued.  The eligibility statement shall specify the amount 
of Oklahoma Affordable Housing Tax Credits allocated to a qualified 
project.  The Oklahoma Housing Finance Agency shall only authorize 
the tax credits created by this section to qualified projects which 
are placed in service after July 1, 2015, but which shall not be 
used to reduce tax liability accruing prior to January 1 , 2016; 
3.  "Federal low-income housing tax credit " means the federal 
tax credit as provided in Section 42 of the Internal Revenue Code o f 
1986, as amended; 
4.  "Oklahoma Affordable Housing Tax Credit " means the tax 
credit created by this section; 
5.  "Qualified project" means a qualified low-income building as 
that term is defined in Section 42 of the Internal Revenue Code of 
1986, as amended; and 
6.  "Taxpayer" means a person, firm or corporation subject to 
the tax imposed by Section 2355 of this title or an insurance 
company subject to the tax imposed by Secti on 624 or 628 of Title 36 
of the Oklahoma Statutes or other financial institu tion subject to 
the tax imposed by Section 2370 of this title. 
C.  For qualified projects placed in service after July 1, 2015, 
the amount of state tax credits created by this sec tion which are   
 
 
Req. No. 175 	Page 3  1 
2 
3 
4 
5 
6 
7 
8 
9 
10 
11 
12 
13 
14 
15 
16 
17 
18 
19 
20 
21 
22 
23 
24 
   1 
2 
3 
4 
5 
6 
7 
8 
9 
10 
11 
12 
13 
14 
15 
16 
17 
18 
19 
20 
21 
22 
23 
24 
  
allocated to a project shall not exceed that of the federal low-
income housing tax credits for a qualified project. The total 
Oklahoma Affordable Housing Tax Credits allocated to all qualified 
projects for an allocation year shall not exceed Four Mill ion 
Dollars ($4,000,000.00).  For purposes of this se ction, the "credit 
period" shall mean the period of ten (10) taxab le years and "placed 
in service" shall have the same meaning as is ap plicable under the 
federal credit program. 
D.  A taxpayer owning an interest in an investment in a 
qualified project sha ll be allowed Oklahoma Affordable Housing Tax 
Credits under this se ction for tax years beginning on or after 
January 1, 2016, if the Okl ahoma Housing Finance Agency issues an 
eligibility statement for suc h project, which tax credit shall be 
allocated among some or all of the partners, members or shareholders 
of the taxpayer owning such interest in any manner agreed to by such 
partners, members or shareholders.  Such taxpayer may assign its 
interest in the investment. 
E.  An insurance company claiming a cre dit against state premium 
tax or retaliatory tax or any other tax imposed by Section 624 or 
628 of Title 36 of the Oklahoma Statutes shal l not be required to 
pay any additional retaliatory tax under Sectio n 628 of Title 36 of 
the Oklahoma Statutes as a res ult of claiming the credit.  The 
credit may fully offset any retalia tory tax imposed by Section 628 
of Title 36 of the Oklahoma Statutes.   
 
 
Req. No. 175 	Page 4  1 
2 
3 
4 
5 
6 
7 
8 
9 
10 
11 
12 
13 
14 
15 
16 
17 
18 
19 
20 
21 
22 
23 
24 
   1 
2 
3 
4 
5 
6 
7 
8 
9 
10 
11 
12 
13 
14 
15 
16 
17 
18 
19 
20 
21 
22 
23 
24 
  
F.  The For tax year 2023 and previous tax years, credit 
authorized by this section shall not be used to redu ce the tax 
liability of the taxpayer to less than zero ($0.00).  For tax year 
2024 and subsequent tax years, if the credit authorized by this 
section exceeds the tax imposed by Section 2355 of this title , by 
Section 624 or 628 of Title 36 of the Oklahoma Statutes , or by 
Section 2370 of this title, the excess amount shall be refunded to 
the taxpayer. 
G.  Any credit claimed but not used in a taxable y ear may be 
carried forward two (2) su bsequent taxable years. 
H.  The owner of a q ualified project eligible for the credit 
authorized by this s ection shall submit, at th e time of filing the 
tax return with the Oklahoma Tax Commission, an eligibility 
statement from the Oklahoma Housing Finance Agency.  In the case of 
failure to attach th e eligibility statement, no credit under this 
section shall be allowed with respect to such project for that year 
until required documents are provided to the Tax Commission. 
I.  If under Section 42 of the Intern al Revenue Code of 1986, as 
amended, a portion of any federal low -income housing credits taken 
on a qualified project is required t o be recaptured durin g the first 
ten (10) years after a project is placed in service, th e taxpayer 
claiming Oklahoma Affordab le Housing Tax Credits with respect to 
such project shall also be required to recapture a portion of such 
credits.  The amount of O klahoma Affordable Ho using Tax Credits   
 
 
Req. No. 175 	Page 5  1 
2 
3 
4 
5 
6 
7 
8 
9 
10 
11 
12 
13 
14 
15 
16 
17 
18 
19 
20 
21 
22 
23 
24 
   1 
2 
3 
4 
5 
6 
7 
8 
9 
10 
11 
12 
13 
14 
15 
16 
17 
18 
19 
20 
21 
22 
23 
24 
  
subject to recapture shall be proportionally equa l to the amount of 
federal low-income housing credits subject to recapture. 
J.  The Oklahoma Housing Finance Agency or the Oklahoma Tax 
Commission may require the filin g of additional docu mentation 
necessary to determine the accuracy of a tax credit claime d. 
K. The Oklahoma Affordable Housin g Act shall undergo a review 
every five (5) years by a committee of nine (9) persons, to be 
appointed three persons each by the Gov ernor, President Pro Tempore 
of the Senate, and the Speaker of the House of Representatives. 
SECTION 2.  This act shall become effective November 1, 2023. 
 
59-1-175 QD 1/15/2023 9:14:06 PM