House | 04/11/2023 | CR; Do Pass Common Education Committee | ||
House | 03/29/2023 | Second Reading referred to Common Education | ||
Senate | 03/08/2023 | Engrossed to House | ||
House | 03/08/2023 | First Reading | ||
Senate | 03/07/2023 | Referred for engrossment | ||
Senate | 03/07/2023 | Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 45 Nays: 0 | ||
Senate | 03/07/2023 | Title restored | ||
Senate | 03/07/2023 | General Order, Amended | ||
Senate | 02/28/2023 | Title stricken | ||
Senate | 02/28/2023 | Reported Do Pass as amended Education committee; CR filed | ||
Senate | 02/07/2023 | Second Reading referred to Education | ||
Senate | 02/06/2023 | Coauthored by Representative Vancuren (principal House author) | ||
Senate | 02/06/2023 | Authored by Senator Stanley |