Oklahoma 2023 Regular Session

Oklahoma Senate Bill SB406 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 16, 2023

Engrossed

Bill April 26, 2023
Bill March 27, 2023

Amended

Bill April 24, 2023
Bill February 16, 2023

Comm Sub

Bill April 20, 2023