House | 04/27/2023 | House Rule suspended | ||
House | 04/11/2023 | CR; Do Pass General Government Committee | ||
House | 03/29/2023 | Second Reading referred to General Government | ||
Senate | 03/14/2023 | Engrossed to House | ||
House | 03/14/2023 | First Reading | ||
Senate | 03/13/2023 | Referred for engrossment | ||
Senate | 03/13/2023 | Measure passed: Ayes: 40 Nays: 4 | ||
Senate | 03/13/2023 | General Order, Considered | ||
Senate | 02/16/2023 | Reported Do Pass General Government committee; CR filed | ||
Senate | 02/13/2023 | Coauthored by Representative Moore (principal House author) | ||
Senate | 02/06/2023 | Authored by Senator Pemberton |