Oklahoma 2023 Regular Session

Oklahoma Senate Bill SB420 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 16, 2023

Engrossed

Bill March 22, 2023

Enrolled

Bill April 24, 2023

Amended

Bill April 13, 2023
Bill March 2, 2023