House | 04/10/2023 | Coauthored by Representative(s) CrosswhiteHader | ||
House | 04/10/2023 | CR; Do Pass Judiciary - Civil Committee | ||
House | 03/29/2023 | Second Reading referred to Judiciary - Civil | ||
Senate | 02/27/2023 | Engrossed to House | ||
House | 02/27/2023 | First Reading | ||
Senate | 02/23/2023 | Referred for engrossment | ||
Senate | 02/23/2023 | Measure passed: Ayes: 48 Nays: 0 | ||
Senate | 02/23/2023 | General Order, Considered | ||
Senate | 02/20/2023 | Coauthored by Representative Roe (principal House author) | ||
Senate | 02/09/2023 | Reported Do Pass Health and Human Services committee; CR filed | ||
Senate | 02/07/2023 | Second Reading referred to Health and Human Services | ||
Senate | 02/06/2023 | Authored by Senator Pugh |