Senate | 04/26/2023 | HAs read | ||
House | 04/26/2023 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | ||
House | 04/25/2023 | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 86 Nays: 0 | ||
House | 04/25/2023 | General Order | ||
House | 04/25/2023 | Referred for engrossment | ||
House | 04/11/2023 | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Banking, Financial Services and Pensions Committee | ||
House | 03/29/2023 | Second Reading referred to Banking, Financial Services and Pensions | ||
Senate | 03/20/2023 | Engrossed to House | ||
House | 03/20/2023 | First Reading | ||
Senate | 03/14/2023 | Measure passed: Ayes: 46 Nays: 0 | ||
Senate | 03/14/2023 | General Order, Considered | ||
Senate | 02/16/2023 | Coauthored by Representative Lepak (principal House author) | ||
Senate | 02/07/2023 | Reported Do Pass Retirement and Insurance committee; CR filed | ||
Senate | 02/07/2023 | Second Reading referred to Retirement and Insurance | ||
Senate | 02/06/2023 | Authored by Senator Montgomery |