Oklahoma 2023 Regular Session

Oklahoma Senate Bill SB452 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 17, 2023

Engrossed

Bill March 6, 2023

Enrolled

Bill April 24, 2023

Amended

Bill April 12, 2023
Bill February 20, 2023

Comm Sub

Bill February 16, 2023