Oklahoma 2023 Regular Session

Oklahoma Senate Bill SB463 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 17, 2023

Engrossed

Bill March 7, 2023

Enrolled

Bill April 26, 2023

Amended

Bill April 6, 2023
Bill February 23, 2023