Senate | 06/09/2023 | Approved by Governor 06/09/2023 | ||
Senate | 05/22/2023 | Sent to Governor | ||
House | 05/22/2023 | Signed, returned to Senate | ||
Senate | 05/22/2023 | Enrolled, to House | ||
Senate | 05/19/2023 | Referred for enrollment | ||
Senate | 05/19/2023 | Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 43 Nays: 3 | ||
Senate | 05/19/2023 | HAs adopted | ||
Senate | 04/25/2023 | HAs read | ||
House | 04/25/2023 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | ||
House | 04/24/2023 | Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 85 Nays: 0 | ||
House | 04/24/2023 | Coauthored by Representative(s) Lepak | ||
House | 04/24/2023 | General Order | ||
House | 04/24/2023 | Referred for engrossment | ||
House | 04/05/2023 | Coauthored by Representative(s) McDugle | ||
House | 04/05/2023 | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Public Safety Committee | ||
House | 03/29/2023 | Second Reading referred to Public Safety | ||
Senate | 03/22/2023 | Engrossed to House | ||
House | 03/22/2023 | First Reading | ||
Senate | 03/21/2023 | Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 43 Nays: 1 | ||
Senate | 03/21/2023 | General Order, Amended | ||
Senate | 02/09/2023 | Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Public Safety committee; CR filed | ||
Senate | 02/08/2023 | Coauthored by Representative Echols (principal House author) | ||
Senate | 02/06/2023 | Authored by Senator Paxton |