Oklahoma 2023 Regular Session

Oklahoma Senate Bill SB486 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 17, 2023

Engrossed

Bill May 1, 2023
Bill March 7, 2023

Enrolled

Bill May 24, 2023

Amended

Bill April 4, 2023
Bill February 27, 2023