House | 04/11/2023 | CR; Do Pass Agriculture Committee | ||
House | 03/29/2023 | Second Reading referred to Agriculture | ||
Senate | 03/06/2023 | Engrossed to House | ||
House | 03/06/2023 | First Reading | ||
Senate | 03/02/2023 | Referred for engrossment | ||
Senate | 03/02/2023 | Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 47 Nays: 0 | ||
Senate | 03/02/2023 | General Order, Considered | ||
Senate | 02/22/2023 | Coauthored by Representative Pfeiffer (principal House author) | ||
Senate | 02/07/2023 | Coauthored by Senator Bullard | ||
Senate | 02/07/2023 | Reported Do Pass Judiciary committee; CR filed | ||
Senate | 02/07/2023 | Second Reading referred to Judiciary | ||
Senate | 02/06/2023 | Authored by Senator Howard |