House | 04/11/2023 | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute County and Municipal Government Committee | ||
House | 03/29/2023 | Second Reading referred to County and Municipal Government | ||
Senate | 02/22/2023 | Engrossed to House | ||
House | 02/22/2023 | First Reading | ||
Senate | 02/21/2023 | Referred for engrossment | ||
Senate | 02/21/2023 | Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 44 Nays: 1 | ||
Senate | 02/21/2023 | General Order, Considered | ||
Senate | 02/13/2023 | Coauthored by Senator Boren | ||
Senate | 02/09/2023 | Coauthored by Representative Nichols (principal House author) | ||
Senate | 02/09/2023 | Reported Do Pass as amended General Government committee; CR filed | ||
Senate | 02/07/2023 | Second Reading referred to General Government | ||
Senate | 02/06/2023 | Authored by Senator Matthews |