Senate | 03/01/2023 | Reported Do Pass Appropriations committee; CR filed | ||
Senate | 02/23/2023 | Referred to Appropriations | ||
Senate | 02/23/2023 | Title stricken | ||
Senate | 02/23/2023 | Reported Do Pass as amended Energy and Telecommunications committee; CR filed | ||
Senate | 02/08/2023 | Coauthored by Senator Kidd | ||
Senate | 02/07/2023 | Second Reading referred to Energy and Telecommunications Committee then to Appropriations Committee | ||
Senate | 02/06/2023 | Coauthored by Representative McCall (principal House author) | ||
Senate | 02/06/2023 | Authored by Senator McCortney | ||
Senate | 02/06/2023 | First Reading |