Oklahoma 2023 Regular Session

Oklahoma Senate Bill SB513 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 17, 2023

Engrossed

Bill April 24, 2023
Bill March 7, 2023

Enrolled

Bill May 22, 2023

Amended

Bill April 6, 2023
Bill February 23, 2023

Comm Sub

Bill February 16, 2023