House | 03/29/2023 | Second Reading referred to Judiciary - Civil | ||
Senate | 03/09/2023 | Engrossed to House | ||
House | 03/09/2023 | First Reading | ||
Senate | 03/08/2023 | Referred for engrossment | ||
Senate | 03/08/2023 | Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 38 Nays: 8 | ||
Senate | 03/08/2023 | General Order, Considered | ||
Senate | 03/06/2023 | Coauthored by Representative Lepak (principal House author) | ||
Senate | 02/07/2023 | Coauthored by Senator Bullard | ||
Senate | 02/07/2023 | Reported Do Pass Judiciary committee; CR filed | ||
Senate | 02/07/2023 | Second Reading referred to Judiciary | ||
Senate | 02/06/2023 | Authored by Senator Daniels |