House | 04/10/2023 | CR; Do Pass Higher Education and Career Tech Committee | ||
House | 03/29/2023 | Second Reading referred to Higher Education and Career Tech | ||
Senate | 03/08/2023 | Engrossed to House | ||
House | 03/08/2023 | First Reading | ||
Senate | 03/07/2023 | Referred for engrossment | ||
Senate | 03/07/2023 | Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 45 Nays: 0 | ||
Senate | 03/07/2023 | General Order, Considered | ||
Senate | 03/02/2023 | Coauthored by Representative West (Tammy) (principal House author) | ||
Senate | 02/21/2023 | Reported Do Pass Education committee; CR filed | ||
Senate | 02/07/2023 | Second Reading referred to Education | ||
Senate | 02/06/2023 | Authored by Senator Pugh |