Senate | 05/05/2023 | Vetoed 05/05/2023 | ||
Senate | 05/01/2023 | Sent to Governor | ||
Senate | 04/27/2023 | Received from the House | ||
Senate | 04/27/2023 | Enrolled, to House | ||
House | 04/27/2023 | Signed, returned to Senate | ||
Senate | 04/26/2023 | Referred for enrollment | ||
House | 04/26/2023 | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 91 Nays: 0 | ||
House | 04/26/2023 | General Order | ||
House | 04/06/2023 | CR; Do Pass Public Health Committee | ||
House | 03/29/2023 | Second Reading referred to Public Health | ||
Senate | 02/22/2023 | Engrossed to House | ||
House | 02/22/2023 | First Reading | ||
Senate | 02/21/2023 | Referred for engrossment | ||
Senate | 02/21/2023 | Measure passed: Ayes: 41 Nays: 5 | ||
Senate | 02/21/2023 | General Order, Considered | ||
Senate | 02/09/2023 | Coauthored by Representative McEntire (principal House author) | ||
Senate | 02/09/2023 | Reported Do Pass Health and Human Services committee; CR filed | ||
Senate | 02/07/2023 | Second Reading referred to Health and Human Services | ||
Senate | 02/06/2023 | Authored by Senator Rosino |