House | 04/10/2023 | CR; Do Pass Judiciary - Civil Committee | ||
House | 03/29/2023 | Second Reading referred to Judiciary - Civil | ||
Senate | 02/23/2023 | Engrossed to House | ||
House | 02/23/2023 | First Reading | ||
Senate | 02/22/2023 | Referred for engrossment | ||
Senate | 02/22/2023 | Measure passed: Ayes: 44 Nays: 0 | ||
Senate | 02/22/2023 | General Order, Considered | ||
Senate | 02/14/2023 | Reported Do Pass as amended Judiciary committee; CR filed | ||
Senate | 02/13/2023 | Coauthored by Representative Caldwell (Chad) (principal House author) | ||
Senate | 02/07/2023 | Second Reading referred to Judiciary | ||
Senate | 02/06/2023 | Authored by Senator Howard |