Oklahoma 2023 Regular Session

Oklahoma Senate Bill SB553 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 17, 2023

Engrossed

Bill March 22, 2023

Enrolled

Bill April 25, 2023

Amended

Bill April 5, 2023
Bill February 15, 2023

Comm Sub

Bill February 14, 2023