House | 03/29/2023 | Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget | ||
Senate | 03/01/2023 | Engrossed to House | ||
House | 03/01/2023 | First Reading | ||
Senate | 02/28/2023 | Referred for engrossment | ||
Senate | 02/28/2023 | Measure passed: Ayes: 47 Nays: 0 | ||
Senate | 02/28/2023 | General Order, Considered | ||
Senate | 02/20/2023 | Reported Do Pass as amended Finance committee; CR filed | ||
Senate | 02/14/2023 | Coauthored by Representative Martinez (principal House author) | ||
Senate | 02/07/2023 | Second Reading referred to Finance | ||
Senate | 02/06/2023 | Authored by Senator Howard |